NJ S1381 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1431
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A1256 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-20 - Substituted by A1256 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Board of Education regulations regarding school nurse certification to include certain minimum eligibility requirements.
Title
Requires State Board of Education regulations regarding school nurse certification to include certain minimum eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | Senate | Substituted by A1256 (1R) |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Bateman) |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1256 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.70.
A1431 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A1431 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session