NJ S1431 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on January 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-25 - Approved P.L.2011, c.2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all wireless telephones and electronic communication devices issued by public entities to be activated to receive Amber Alerts.
Title
Requires all wireless telephones and electronic communication devices issued by public entities to be activated to receive Amber Alerts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Approved P.L.2011, c.2. | |
2010-12-13 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-1) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for A2781 | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2781 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Substituted by S1431