NJ S1455 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3406
Note: Carry Foward to future S2958
Note: Carry Over of previous A4810
Note: Carry Over of previous S441
Note: Carry Over of previous S750
Note: Carry Over of previous A1806
Note: Carry Foward to future S2958
Note: Carry Over of previous A4810
Note: Carry Over of previous S441
Note: Carry Over of previous S750
Note: Carry Over of previous A1806
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Government Efficiency and Regulatory Review Commission.
Title
Establishes Government Efficiency and Regulatory Review Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] |
Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1455 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1455 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4810 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S441 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4810
A4161 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S750 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1806 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S1455 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4810 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S441 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4810
A4161 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S750 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1806 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1455 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S1500/1455_I1.HTM |