NJ S1493 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2813
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.300.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.300.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits landlords from requiring residential tenants to pay rent and other related charges through electronic funds transfer; requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments.
Title
Prohibits landlords from requiring residential tenants to pay rent and other related charges through electronic funds transfer; requires landlords to provide receipts for cash payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1749 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.300. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-3-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A1749 (1R) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2813 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1749 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1493 (1R)
A1749 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S1493 (1R)