NJ S1498 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Approved P.L.2014, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates exemption from noise control restrictions for certain bars in Atlantic City Tourism District.*
Title
Eliminates exemption from noise control restrictions for certain bars in Atlantic City Tourism District.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2708 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2708 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2708 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2708 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.24. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A2708 (1R) |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2708 (Same As) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by S1498 (1R)