NJ S1498 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2220
Note: Carry Over of previous A3308
Note: Carry Over of previous A3308
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidates for certain teaching certificates to pass written test on foundations of teaching reading and diagnosing reading difficulties.
Title
Requires candidates for certain teaching certificates to pass written test on foundations of teaching reading and diagnosing reading difficulties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2220 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3677 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3308 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3677 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3308 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1498 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1498_I1.HTM |