NJ S1549 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A691
Note: Carry Foward to future S1674
Note: Carry Over of previous S2175
Note: Carry Over of previous A938
Note: Carry Foward to future S1674
Note: Carry Over of previous S2175
Note: Carry Over of previous A938
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local government notification of sex offender registration and prohibits sex offenders from living near schools, child care centers or playgrounds.
Title
Requires local government notification of sex offender registration and prohibits sex offenders from living near schools, child care centers or playgrounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1549 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1549 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A751 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2175 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A938 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1549 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A751 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2175 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A938 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1549 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1549_I1.HTM |