NJ S1551 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2295
Note: Carry Over of previous A1515
Note: Carry Over of previous A1515
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes creation of local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct; appropriates $600,000.
Title
Authorizes creation of local civilian review boards to review police operations and conduct; appropriates $600,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2295 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1515 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3441 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
A1515 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3441 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1551 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1551_I1.HTM |