NJ S1568 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3674
Note: Carry Over of previous A5214
Note: Carry Over of previous A5214
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides child tax credit for taxpayers with children ages six to 11 and increases amount of credit for taxpayers with children under 12 over period of two years.
Title
Provides child tax credit for taxpayers with children ages six to 11 and increases amount of credit for taxpayers with children under 12 over period of two years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3674 (Carry Over) 2023-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5214 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3428 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
A5214 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3428 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1568 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1568_I1.HTM |