NJ S1584 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2734
Note: Carry Foward to future S1534
Note: Carry Over of previous A3662
Note: Carry Over of previous S1331
Note: Carry Foward to future S1534
Note: Carry Over of previous A3662
Note: Carry Over of previous S1331
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases annual property tax deduction for senior citizens and disabled persons from $250 to $500.
Title
Increases annual property tax deduction for senior citizens and disabled persons from $250 to $500.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1584 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1584 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3662 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1331 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3370 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1584 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3662 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S1331 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3370 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1584 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1584_I1.HTM |