NJ S1593 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2324
Note: Carry Over of previous S1435
Note: Carry Over of previous S1435
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Pending: Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides foreclosure stay of proceedings for certain residential borrowers and exempts certain lenders that offer sustainable mortgage modifications.*
Title
Provides foreclosure stay of proceedings for certain residential borrowers and exempts certain lenders that offer sustainable mortgage modifications.*
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-4) |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1593 (Carry Over) 2016-09-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1435 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4505 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1435 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4505 (Same As) 2017-01-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee