NJ S1645 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5959
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Combined with S399 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-09 - Combined with S399 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires residential landlords to install protective covers on steam radiators.
Title
Requires residential landlords to install protective covers on steam radiators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Combined with S399 (SCS) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1380 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Combined with A869 (ACS)
A5959 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A5959 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee