NJ S1668 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A181
Note: Carry Foward to future S1869
Note: Carry Over of previous S2031
Note: Carry Foward to future S1869
Note: Carry Over of previous S2031
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum dollar amount required in Maintenance and Preservation Funds of cemetery companies established before December 1, 1971.
Title
Establishes minimum dollar amount required in Maintenance and Preservation Funds of cemetery companies established before December 1, 1971.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1668 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1668 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2031 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4449 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1668 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2031 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4449 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee