NJ S1696 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1736
Note: Carry Foward to future S1926
Note: Carry Over of previous A788
Note: Carry Over of previous S1394
Note: Carry Foward to future S1926
Note: Carry Over of previous A788
Note: Carry Over of previous S1394
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Caps State use portion of energy tax revenues and ensures balance of such revenues are paid annually as municipal aid.
Title
Caps State use portion of energy tax revenues and ensures balance of such revenues are paid annually as municipal aid.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1696 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1696 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A719 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A788 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1394 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1696 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A719 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A788 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1394 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1696 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1696_I1.HTM |