NJ S1709 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A606 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A606 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crime of entering into certain restricted airport areas.
Title
Establishes crime of entering into certain restricted airport areas.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A606 (1R) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A606 (Same As) 2013-08-14 - Approved P.L.2013, c.138.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1709 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1709_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1709_R1.HTM |