NJ S1740 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3561
Note: Carry Foward to future S412
Note: Carry Over of previous A2046
Note: Carry Foward to future S412
Note: Carry Over of previous A2046
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Title
"Historic Property Reinvestment Act"; provides credits against certain taxes for certain costs of rehabilitating historic properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Senate | Combined with S2031 (SCS) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
A1311 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A2046 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1740 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Combined with S2031 (SCS)
A1311 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A2046 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee