NJ S1754 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Approved P.L.2013, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Approved P.L.2013, c.34.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes parameters of existing exemption for certain beach bars from noise control standards.*
Title
Changes parameters of existing exemption for certain beach bars from noise control standards.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2946 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2946 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.34. |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-1-0) |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | Substituted for A2946 (1R) |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism and the Arts Committee |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2946 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Substituted by S1754 (1R)