NJ S1759 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
Title
Expands eligibility for veterans' civil service preference; creates additional preference benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1798 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
A1915 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1915 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee