NJ S1796 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S875
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2586 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2586 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Energy Infrastructure Study Commission."
Title
Establishes "Energy Infrastructure Study Commission."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A2586 (2R) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1796 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A2586 (2R)
A2586 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A2586 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session