NJ S1796 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2134
Note: Carry Foward to future S2004
Note: Carry Over of previous S3987
Note: Carry Over of previous A5959
Note: Carry Over of previous A3301
Note: Carry Foward to future S2004
Note: Carry Over of previous S3987
Note: Carry Over of previous A5959
Note: Carry Over of previous A3301
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits four-year public institution of higher education from charging tuition and fees to student who is spouse or dependent child of disabled veteran.
Title
Prohibits four-year public institution of higher education from charging tuition and fees to student who is spouse or dependent child of disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1796 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1796 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1590 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3987 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5959 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3301 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1796 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1590 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S3987 (Carry Over) 2021-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A5959 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A3301 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1796 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1796_I1.HTM |