NJ S1803 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1218
Note: Carry Foward to future S998
Note: Carry Foward to future S1406
Note: Carry Over of previous A1658
Note: Carry Over of previous S1213
Note: Carry Foward to future S998
Note: Carry Foward to future S1406
Note: Carry Over of previous A1658
Note: Carry Over of previous S1213
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to reimburse counties for portion of holiday pay to county employees performing State services on certain holidays.
Title
Requires State to reimburse counties for portion of holiday pay to county employees performing State services on certain holidays.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1803 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1803 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1803 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2033 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1658 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1213 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1803 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1803 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2033 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1658 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1213 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1803 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1803_I1.HTM |