NJ S1807 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes credit unions to serve as public depositories of public funds; requires credit unions to provide certain funds for financial literacy education.*
Title
Authorizes credit unions to serve as public depositories of public funds; requires credit unions to provide certain funds for financial literacy education.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, c.108. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Assembly (67-8-2) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for A1597 (1R) | |
2011-06-16 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by the Senate (29-6) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1597 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by S1807 (2R)