NJ S1825 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning mobility and support services needs of NJ adults with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Establishes task force to study and make recommendations concerning mobility and support services needs of NJ adults with autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3432 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.53. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Substituted for A3432 |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3432 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S1825