NJ S1829 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by A2592 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by A2592 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Sara's Law;" requires Motor Vehicle Commission to establish next-of-kin program.
Title
"Sara's Law;" requires Motor Vehicle Commission to establish next-of-kin program.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Thomas Goodwin [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | Substituted by A2592 (2R) | |
2010-12-06 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-13 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-09-13 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2592 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.47.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1829 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1829_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1829_R1.HTM |