NJ S1829 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S489
Note: Carry Foward to future A3978
Note: Carry Foward to future A3978
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases amount of benefits under Work First New Jersey program.*
Title
Increases amount of benefits under Work First New Jersey program.*
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A30 (1R) |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1829 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
S1829 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
A30 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S1829 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by A30 (1R)
A30 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly