NJ S1832 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1243
Note: Carry Over of previous S2545
Note: Carry Over of previous S2545
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns expedited process for foreclosing vacant and abandoned residential properties in uncontested actions.
Title
Concerns expedited process for foreclosing vacant and abandoned residential properties in uncontested actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1832 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2545 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3823 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2545 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A3823 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading