NJ S1846 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-22 - Substituted by A410 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-22 - Substituted by A410 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the "Construction Lien Law."
Title
Revises the "Construction Lien Law."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-22 | Substituted by A410 (1R) | |
2010-11-08 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A410 (Same As) 2011-01-05 - Approved P.L.2010, c.119.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S1846 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1846_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2000/1846_R1.HTM |