NJ S1894 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.25.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires "breakfast after the bell" program in all schools with 70% or more of students eligible for free or reduced price meals.
Title
Requires "breakfast after the bell" program in all schools with 70% or more of students eligible for free or reduced price meals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3506 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.25. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-5-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3506 (2R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3506 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1894 (2R)