NJ S1901 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3281
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Medicaid program to provide housing-related services to individuals experiencing chronic homelessness.
Title
Establishes Medicaid program to provide housing-related services to individuals experiencing chronic homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3082 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3281 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3281 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee