NJ S1914 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain user fees for the provision of traditional municipal services to be included within the 2% municipal and county property tax levy cap.
Title
Requires certain user fees for the provision of traditional municipal services to be included within the 2% municipal and county property tax levy cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Sweeney) |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2975 (Same As) 2012-05-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee