NJ S1914 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A1263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits act, practice or arrangement constituting stranger-originated life insurance.
Title
Prohibits act, practice or arrangement constituting stranger-originated life insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A1263 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1263 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.105.