NJ S1916 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2197
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows person with allergy to drugs or medications to voluntarily make notation on drivers license.
Title
Allows person with allergy to drugs or medications to voluntarily make notation on drivers license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A846 (Same As) 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2197 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2197 (Carry Over) 2015-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading