NJ S1926 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Substituted by A2652 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Substituted by A2652 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Bans charging workers' compensation claimants for medical expenses, gives Division of Workers' Compensation sole jurisdiction over work-related medical claims.
Title
Bans charging workers' compensation claimants for medical expenses, gives Division of Workers' Compensation sole jurisdiction over work-related medical claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | Senate | Substituted by A2652 (1R) |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2652 (Same As) 2012-11-19 - Approved P.L.2012, c.67.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1926 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1926_I1.HTM |