NJ S1926 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3484
Note: Carry Over of previous A5075
Note: Carry Over of previous A5075
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain requirements concerning rights of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, questioning, queer, intersex, and HIV-positive residents of long-term care facilities.
Title
Establishes certain requirements concerning rights of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, questioning, queer, intersex, and HIV-positive residents of long-term care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A680 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S3484 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5075 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3484 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5075 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1926 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1926_I1.HTM |