NJ S1945 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A1516 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A1516 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates mailed manufacturer's rebates.
Title
Regulates mailed manufacturer's rebates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A1516 (1R) |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1516 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S1945 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2000/1945_I1.HTM |