NJ S195 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S707
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A1645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A1645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of "acquisition," for purposes of county and municipal open space trust funds, to include demolition, removal of debris, and restoration of lands being acquired.
Title
Expands definition of "acquisition," for purposes of county and municipal open space trust funds, to include demolition, removal of debris, and restoration of lands being acquired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A1645 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S707 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A1645 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.154.
A1645 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.154.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S195 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/195_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S195 |