NJ S1961 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Veterans Higher Education Commission."
Title
Establishes "Veterans Higher Education Commission."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3011 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3011 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.64. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3011 (1R) |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3011 (Same As) 2013-04-29 - Substituted by S1961 (1R)