NJ S1961 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in emergency shelters, rooming and boarding houses, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.*
Title
Establishes certain minimum and maximum temperatures in emergency shelters, rooming and boarding houses, and certain nursing homes and residential health care facilities.*
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Angel Fuentes [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4111 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4111 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (61-1-0) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A4111 |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1961 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4111 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S1961 (3R)
A4111 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S1961 (3R)