NJ S1967 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S3096
Note: Carry Foward to future A3168
Note: Carry Foward to future S1589
Note: Carry Over of previous S2500
Note: Carry Over of previous A1240
Note: Carry Foward to future A3168
Note: Carry Foward to future S1589
Note: Carry Over of previous S2500
Note: Carry Over of previous A1240
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades penalties for certain crimes involving heroin and fentanyl; establishes new crimes concerning heroin mixtures; allows certain defendants to be eligible for drug court.
Title
Upgrades penalties for certain crimes involving heroin and fentanyl; establishes new crimes concerning heroin mixtures; allows certain defendants to be eligible for drug court.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1967 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1967 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1967 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2195 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2500 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1967 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1967 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2195 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2500 (Carry Over) 2018-04-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1967 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1967_I1.HTM |