NJ S1981 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4205
Note: Carry Over of previous A5752
Note: Carry Over of previous A5752
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands authority of pharmacy technician in administering drugs and vaccines and permits pharmacists and pharmacy interns, externs, and technicians to administer COVID-19 vaccine.
Title
Expands authority of pharmacy technician in administering drugs and vaccines and permits pharmacists and pharmacy interns, externs, and technicians to administer COVID-19 vaccine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4205 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5752 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1899 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (58-17-1)
A5752 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1899 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (58-17-1)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1981 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1981_I1.HTM |