NJ S1991 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S111
Note: Carry Foward to future A3997
Note: Carry Over of previous A2660
Note: Carry Over of previous S1911
Note: Carry Foward to future A3997
Note: Carry Over of previous A2660
Note: Carry Over of previous S1911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Health to establish maternity care public awareness campaign.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Health to establish maternity care public awareness campaign.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1991 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1991 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2574 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2660 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1911 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1991 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2574 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2660 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1911 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1991 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1991_I1.HTM |