NJ S2014 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2887
Note: Carry Over of previous A3500
Note: Carry Over of previous A3500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates motor vehicle offenses related to special paratransit vehicles.
Title
Creates motor vehicle offenses related to special paratransit vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S481 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2014 (Carry Over) 2018-02-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A2315 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3500 (Carry Over) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2315 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A3500 (Carry Over) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee