NJ S2039 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1412
Note: Carry Foward to future A565
Note: Carry Foward to future A565
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits gender-based price discrimination.
Title
Prohibits gender-based price discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Gill) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2039 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2039 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A5488 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2039 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
A5488 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee