NJ S2044 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5073
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."
Title
Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1896 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.204. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1896 (2R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (38-0) (Turner) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1896 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2044 (2R)
A5073 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5073 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee