NJ S2045 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3568
Note: Carry Over of previous A5335
Note: Carry Over of previous A5335
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain animals used in testing to be offered for adoption; requires establishment of procedures for assessment and disposition of animals; establishes penalties for noncompliance.
Title
Requires certain animals used in testing to be offered for adoption; requires establishment of procedures for assessment and disposition of animals; establishes penalties for noncompliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3568 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5335 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A3491 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
A5335 (Carry Over) 2023-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
A3491 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2045 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2045_I1.HTM |