NJ S2051 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4600
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes certain notification and reporting requirements on certain persons not required or authorized to collect sales and use tax.
Title
Imposes certain notification and reporting requirements on certain persons not required or authorized to collect sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4600 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A4206 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4206 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading