NJ S2057 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2044
Note: Carry Foward to future A3945
Note: Carry Foward to future A3945
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain possession, sale, offering for sale, trade or distribution of shark fins.
Title
Prohibits certain possession, sale, offering for sale, trade or distribution of shark fins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-10) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2057 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2057 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4093 (Same As) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2057 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4093 (Same As) 2015-12-14 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading