NJ S2100 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits new employees of certain organizations from enrolling in State-administered retirement system or health care plan of public employer. *
Title
Prohibits new employees of certain organizations from enrolling in State-administered retirement system or health care plan of public employer. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-10-01 | Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to enact | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2010-08-23 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-19 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2499 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Barnes)