NJ S2100 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes certain qualification requirements for members of State Ethics Commission; provides process for appointment of members.*
Title
Imposes certain qualification requirements for members of State Ethics Commission; provides process for appointment of members.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3897 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee