NJ S2117 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "New Jersey Senior Labor Task Force."
Title
Creates "New Jersey Senior Labor Task Force."
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Thomas Goodwin [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee | |
2011-05-23 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Motion To Table (23-16) (Buono) | |
2010-12-13 | Motion To Relieve from SLA (Kean, S.) | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |